Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Use of Wireless Communication Device - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Robey, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, Montgomery, Peters, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that require enforcement as a secondary offense of specified violations involving the use of a wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle; altering the penalty imposed for a violation of a specified prohibition on the use of a handheld telephone while operating a motor vehicle; prohibiting, under specified circumstances, the assessment of points for a second or subsequent violation of a prohibition on the use of a handheld telephone while operating a motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0753
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0217 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568173/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568173/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568173/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {200913/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (109-29)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Malone) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-29)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {568173/1 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {568173/1 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {568173/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {200913/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (109-29) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Motion Recede (Delegate Malone) Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Recede 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (108-29) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1124, 21-1124.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM