Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "school vehicle" to include specified vehicles that meet or comply with specified standards and requirements, were originally titled and used to transport children, students, and teachers in another state, comply with the regulations on transporting children enrolled in the federally funded Head Start Program, and are used only for transporting children to and from a Head Start program.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {298075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {593922/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {298075/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Floor Amendment {593922/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-154, 11-173, 11-174 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM