Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Guzzone, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Pugh, and Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified policies of public senior higher education institutions promote specified purposes and be similar to specified provisions concerning required clauses for procurement contracts.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0837
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324737/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {324737/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM