Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Advisory Bodies - Advisory Opinions and Informal Advice
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Ethics Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified advisory bodies to issue informal advice instead of an advisory opinion; and specifying that information related to informal advice provided by an advisory body shall remain confidential and is not subject to specified publication requirements.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM