Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Ready, Serafini, Waugh, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible costs" as it relates to projects that receive funding from the Bay Restoration Fund to include any wastewater facility upgrade to enhanced nutrient removal, as determined by the Department of the Environment.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704134/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {780912/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {704134/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {780912/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text - Chapter - Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - Expansion
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM