Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Frosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a maximum oyster inspection tax that may be imposed by the Potomac River Fisheries Commission; requiring the Potomac River Fisheries Commission to use the proceeds of the oyster inspection tax solely for planting seed or shell oyster on working bottom; increasing a maximum penalty for the violation of specified regulations; making the Act subject to a specified contingency; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0357
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314238/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {940210/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-19)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {314238/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 49
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {940210/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-19) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM