Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing requirements for the holding of specified assets owned by a specified Methodist Church; and repealing provisions of law providing for the effect of the absence of a trust clause in a specified deed or other conveyance executed before a specified date.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0840
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0910 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM