Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, and Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified individual to request that a State's Attorney certify that a conviction was made in error under specified circumstances; providing that an individual is eligible for a specified grant from the Board of Public Works if a State's Attorney has certified that the individual's conviction was made in error; establishing the Task Force to Study Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 15, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0593
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {222617/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-51)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Gubernatorial Pardon Requirement - Repeal
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {138071/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Judiciary 46
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {222617/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (89-51) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Text - Chapter - State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM