Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany, Carroll, Cecil, Garrett, and Harford Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the requirement for the Comptroller to withhold Maryland income tax refunds of specified individuals with outstanding warrants to include residents of Allegany, Carroll, Cecil, Garrett, and Harford counties or individuals who have outstanding warrants from Allegany, Carroll, Cecil, Garrett and Harford counties; making nonsubstantive changes to specified termination provisions; making conforming changes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0560
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016, October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {813521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Norman) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {943524/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
36
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Edwards) Adopted 31
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {813521/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Norman) Adopted 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {943524/1 Adopted 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 36
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935, 13-936, 13-937 through 13-940 )
(   2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM