Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering to December 31 the date by which Somerset County is required to submit a certain financial report with the Department of Legislative Services and report the results of a certain audit with the Legislative Auditor.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 28
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text - Chapter - Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-304, 16-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM