Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Madaleno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring individuals convicted of vulnerable-adult abuse to register with a specified supervising authority by a specified time and to register annually with a local law enforcement unit for a specified term; requiring a specified registration to include a digital image that shall be updated at least once each year; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a specified registry and to provide specified information on the Internet; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0054
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/01/2013 3/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-7A-01 through 11-7A-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM