Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing participating secondary schools to serve breakfast in any part of the school, including from "Grab and Go" carts; and clarifying when breakfast in the classroom should be served.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted 31
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 31
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 32
Text - Third - Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Referred Ways and Means 37
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM