Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the procedures for preparing and adopting a budget for Calvert County; requiring each county department, agency, or board receiving county funds to submit a specified itemized budget request on or before a date set by the County Commissioners of Calvert County; requiring the County Commissioners to conduct a public hearing on a specified staff-recommended budget and a subsequent public hearing on the County Commissioners' budget; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {150018/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {150018/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Recede 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM