Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Bailey, Carozza, and Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a special charter boat license issued by the Department of Natural Resources is valid for all individuals on a single vessel operated by a certain licensed fishing guide and for certain individuals on a vessel under the guidance of a certain licensed fishing guide in tidal waters of the State.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Limited Fishing Guide License - Payment for Service - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Limited Fishing Guide License - Payment for Service - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {320418/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Limited Fishing Guide License - Payment for Service - Alteration
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Limited Fishing Guide License - Payment for Service - Alteration
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {320418/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM