Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Great Preschools Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or a corporation a credit against the State income tax for contributions to specified scholarship-granting organizations; providing for the carryover of unused credits for 3 years; requiring scholarship-granting organizations to take specified actions to be eligible for donations for which a tax credit may be claimed; requiring the Comptroller to administer the Great Preschools Tax Credit Program; applying the Act to taxable years after 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0603 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/06/2015 Text - First - Great Preschools Tax Credit Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM