Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of State Board of Pharmacy regulations to prescribe and dispense specified contraceptives; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2018, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians, the State Board of Nursing, and specified stakeholders to adopt regulations establishing the conditions under which pharmacists may prescribe and dispense contraceptives; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464531/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-22)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {464531/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (115-22) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-148 )
(   12-101, 12-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM