Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Astle, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, Klausmeier, Manno, Middleton, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zucker, Madaleno, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, King, McFadden, Peters, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified eligibility criteria for specified credits under the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit to include specified persons who establish or expand in specified areas a business facility that, for business incubators, creates at least 25 qualified positions at the facility under specified circumstances; authorizing specified business incubators to claim a refund of specified project tax credits or start-up tax credits; applying the Act retroactively to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1007
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0560 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {209732/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {209732/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-401, 6-402, 6-403, 6-404, 6-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM