Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Bailey, Carozza, Ellis, Gallion, Kagan, Lam, Patterson, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Election Day Page Program to stimulate student interest in elections, provide assistance to election judges, and assist elderly and disabled voters at polling places; requiring the State Board of Elections to develop a page training program for use by participating local boards that includes the duties, responsibilities, and prohibited conduct of pages at polling places; requiring participating local boards, in collaboration with local school systems, to establish a procedure for the selection of pages; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614635/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {183423/2 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {385763/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614635/1 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614635/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Floor Amendment {183423/2 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Ways and Means 43A
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {385763/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401 through 10-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM