Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Frosh, Jones-Rodwell, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or a corporation a credit against the State income tax for costs directly associated with making a Web site accessible to blind individuals; requiring an individual or a corporation that claims the credit to provide verification of the amount of the costs; making the credit refundable; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0550
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM