Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Conway, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, and Pinsky
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy; requiring the Task Force to review, study, and develop findings and recommendations regarding forest conservation in Maryland; authorizing the Task Force to consult with the Chesapeake Bay Program and other entities to gather information about data, models, and policies useful to carrying out its mission; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Forest Conservation Act - Exemption, Reforestation Rate, and Forest Conservation Fund - Alterations
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {254131/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM