Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Peters and DeGrange
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund annual report to include information on each award recipient's employer, a specified summary of award recipients' research results and accomplishments, and specified award tracking information; requiring that a summary of research results and accomplishments meet specified disclosure standards and include specified information under specified circumstances; and authorizing a specified summary of research results and accomplishments to exclude specified information.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0779
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {107473/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {107473/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 55A
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-429, 10-442 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM