Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring that specified industrial wind energy conversion systems comply with specified setback requirements; authorizing specified variances under specified circumstances; requiring that, before a permit is issued for specified industrial wind energy conversion systems, the Garrett County Department of Planning and Land Development retain at the applicant's expense a specified professional engineer to prepare a specified cost estimate and require the applicant to post a specified bond; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0504
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767171/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {767171/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM