Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that provisions of law concerning the Sunday sale of alcoholic beverages in Garrett County apply to a precinct of an election district in which the voters in a referendum authorized by law approve Sunday sales; specifying that provisions of law concerning Sunday sales apply to a holder of a Class D license operating an establishment that meets four specifications; and providing for specified fees.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0464
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 30
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed 30
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 35
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM