Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, King, Montgomery, Peters, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the amount of the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for specified time periods; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to set the rate in a specified manner on or after a specified date; requiring that the Commissioner publish the rate in the Maryland Register on or before a specified date every 3 years; altering the age under which specified individuals are exempt from the Maryland Wage and Hour Law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-403, 3-413, 3-414.1, 3-419 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM