Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Madaleno, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, Manno, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum required percentage of energy that must be derived from Tier 1 renewable sources in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in specified years; altering the minimum required percentage of Tier 1 renewable energy that must be derived from solar energy in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in specified years; establishing renewable energy portfolio standards for 2018 to 2025; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0377
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-703, 7-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM