Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Revenue Distribution - Maryland State Arts Council
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a distribution of revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars to provide up to an aggregate amount of $1,000,000 to the Special Fund for Preservation of Cultural Arts in Maryland; providing that the Maryland State Arts Council is entitled to a specified revenue distribution from the State's specified admissions and amusement tax; requiring that the funds distributed to the Council be included in the Council's prior fiscal year appropriations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0451
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {769032/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hixson) {573125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {769032/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 57
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Hixson) {573125/1 Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501, 4-512, 4-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM