Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Colburn, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Jones-Rodwell, King, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Stone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a mortgage assistance relief service provider providing mortgage assistance relief in connection with a dwelling in the State that does not comply with specified provisions of federal law is in violation of the Act; authorizing the Attorney General or the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to seek an injunction to prohibit a violation of the Act; authorizing the Commissioner to enforce the provisions of the Act by exercising specified powers and requiring a violator to take specified affirmative action; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0291
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938673/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {300117/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {938673/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {300117/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1901 )
(   7-501 through 7-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM