Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic Form
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Ferguson, Forehand, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Manno, Middleton, Peters, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Council for the Procurement of Health, Education, and Social Services to establish a workgroup to determine a process for specified entities to submit specified electronic documents to specified agencies; requiring the Council to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0327
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904433/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {566389/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments {904433/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {566389/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM