Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Eckardt, Ferguson, Kelley, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Peters, and Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the State Board of Nursing; requiring that specified petitions for membership on the Board have at least a specified number of signatures of support from nurses with a specified license; altering the requirements for the election of Board officers; requiring the Board to hold a special election within a specified time period to fill a specified vacancy of a Board officer under specified circumstances; altering the requirements for a quorum of the Board; authorizing the Board to employ a deputy director; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224232/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876485/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {224232/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {876485/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Text - Chapter - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-202, 8-203, 8-204, 8-205, 8-208, 8-302, 8-302.1, 8-304, 8-305, 8-306, 8-312, 8-315, 8-316, 8-401, 8-505, 8-601, 8-6A-07, 8-6A-08, 8-6A-10, 8-6A-13, 8-6B-10, 8-6B-14, 8-6B-18, 8-6B-26, 8-701 through 8-703, 8-705, 8-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM