Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, dental plan organizations, fraternal benefit organizations, managed care organizations, and certain other persons to be subject to a certain 2.75% assessment in calendar year 2019; establishing that the purpose of the assessment is to recoup a certain aggregate amount of the health insurance provider fee for certain purposes; requiring distribution of the assessment to the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {727070/1
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {727070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {846482/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-48)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Health Care Access Program - Establishment (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {727070/1 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {727070/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {846482/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (90-48) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
(   15-1202, 15-1301, 6-102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page