Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maintenance of Effort - Lease Payment Exclusion
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding specified lease payments made by a local school district from the maintenance of effort calculation.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM