Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures
Sponsored by
Senator Robey
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Automotive Safety Enforcement Division of the Department of State Police to establish the manner and format for the submission of an inspection certificate for the transfer of a used motor vehicle; establishing that the Division may authorize electronic submission of an inspection certificate for a used motor vehicle; requiring the Division to authorize the use of inspection certificate forms for the submission of an inspection certificate; requiring the Department to submit a specified report on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0246
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {978370/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {978370/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {978370/1 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {978370/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 44
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-101, 23-103, 23-106, 23-107, 23-108, 23-108.1, 23-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM