Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law relating to the Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact; repealing the State's agreement to enter into the compact; repealing the statutory provisions reciting the compact; repealing provisions relating to the appointment, terms, and removal of members of the Maryland delegation to the Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact Commission; repealing the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to obtain certain information in a certain manner to be used by certain persons; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text - Chapter - Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
(   2-801 through 2-805 )
(   1998, 1999 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page