Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Imagination Stage HVAC System
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Feldman, Forehand, King, Madaleno, Montgomery, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of Imagination Stage, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Imagination Stage HVAC system, located in Montgomery County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0750
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2015 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 171). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 171 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM