Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a specified disclosure provided by a lender to a borrower in compliance with a specified federal law shall satisfy specified disclosure requirements under provisions of law governing closed end credit loans secured by a first mortgage or first deed of trust on residential real property; requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to monitor specified federal requirements and notify the Governor and the General Assembly if the Commissioner makes a specified determination; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Revolving and Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {937378/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Economic Matters 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Text - Chapter - Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
(   12-1022, 12-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page