Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Eckardt, Klausmeier, Manno, and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Nursing appoint specified peer review committees; authorizing the Board to appoint peer advisory committees to provide the Board with expert advice related to the practice of nursing by advance practice nurses; providing that a member of a peer advisory committee is entitled to receive compensation, as determined by the Board, and reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0490
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {304432/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {304432/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 55
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-503, 8-707, 8-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM