Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
Sponsored by
Chair, Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain contingency relating to the adoption of a certain amendment to the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact; entering the State into a certain amendment to the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact; and providing for the withdrawal of the State from the amendment.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 36
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 39
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Text - Chapter - Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM