Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Salling
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a presumption that a garnishment against specified property held jointly by spouses in specified financial institutions is valid unless, within 30 days after service of the writ of garnishment on the garnishee, either spouse files a motion objecting to the garnishment and serves a copy of the motion on the judgment creditor, the garnishee, and any other person named on the account; and altering specified terminology.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 35
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Judiciary 36
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM