Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh and Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a claim for damages due to medical injury to be referred to the Director of the Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office to select an independent medical review panel if a defendant asserts as a defense that specified clinical practice guidelines apply and the defendant acted in accordance with the guidelines; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations establishing clinical practice guidelines for obstetrical and gynecological services; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2A-03A, 3-2A-03B )
(   2-701, 2-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM