Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Freestate ChalleNGe Academy - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate general funds to the Maryland Freestate ChalleNGe Academy in an amount equal to 25% of a specified target per pupil foundation amount for specified cadets beginning in fiscal year 2018; requiring a county board of education to reimburse a specified fund a specified amount for specified cadets; requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Military Department and the State Department of Education, to establish a specified process; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 13
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-410 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM