Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, King, Lee, Manno, Muse, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing collective bargaining rights for community college employees; establishing procedures for the selection of an exclusive bargaining representative; establishing that a maximum of six bargaining units may be designated; requiring certain contracts and agreements entered into before October 1, 2018, to remain in effect until the agreement or contract expires; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0667
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0652 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-403, 16-412, 16-414.1, 16-701 through 16-709 )
(   3-2A-01, 3-2A-05, 3-2A-07, 3-2A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM