Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Gallion, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Peters, Ready, Simonaire, Smith, West, Young, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, King, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the dwelling house of disabled veterans with a service-connected disability rating of at least 50%; providing for the amount of the property tax credit; requiring certain disabled veterans to provide certain documentation; authorizing certain governing bodies to provide the credit to a certain surviving spouse; applying the Act to tax years after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {369932/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments {369932/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page