Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Conway, Gladden, Madaleno, Pinsky, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Muse
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, when an individual is arrested for failure to appear in court to show cause why the individual should not be found in contempt for failure to answer interrogatories or to appear for an examination in aid of enforcement of a money judgment, that the individual be taken immediately before either the court that issued the order that resulted in the arrest, or before a judicial officer of the District Court, for determination of conditions of release; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0596
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {818973/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {932717/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senators Gladden, Stone, and Frosh
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Delegates Anderson, Valentino-Smith, and McComas
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {818973/2 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {932717/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-1) 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senators Gladden, Stone, and Frosh 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 House Refuses to Recede 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Delegates Anderson, Valentino-Smith, and McComas 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM