Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications would be described as being in the skilled service or the professional service; providing certain requirements for employees hired beginning July 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0678 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 39
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Reassigned to Appropriations 46
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-41) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-104, 2-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM