Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the group of persons who may file a certain petition for postconviction DNA testing or a database or log search; authorizing a court to order a certain remedy under certain circumstances for certain classes of persons filing for postconviction DNA testing; establishing a standard required to file a petition for writ of actual innocence by a person convicted as a result of a guilty plea, an Alford plea, or a plea of nolo contendere; authorizing a court to order a certain remedy under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0395
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {222515/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (132-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {218176/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {222515/1 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (132-0) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 69
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-201, 8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM