Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Augustine, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2022, the Maryland Transit Administration from entering into a contract to purchase buses for the Administration's transit bus fleet that are not electric buses; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2021, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; providing for the contents of the annual report; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page