Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis – Regulation of Dispensaries, Growers, and Processors
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that growers, processors, and dispensaries licensed under certain provisions of law are subject to the Maryland Antitrust Act and the Maryland Sales Below Cost Act; repealing the provision prohibiting the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission from issuing more than one medical cannabis grower license to each applicant; requiring the Commission to allow a person to have an ownership interest in or control of up to four dispensaries licensed under a certain provision of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Licensed Dispensaries
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468570/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468570/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468570/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468570/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {573620/1 (Senator West)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {573620/1 (Senator West) Withdrawn
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {573620/2 (Senator West)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Substitute Floor Amendment {573620/2 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-7)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Licensed Dispensaries
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468570/1 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468570/1 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator West) Adopted 45
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468570/1 49
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator West) Adopted 49
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468570/1 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator West) Adopted 55
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468570/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Floor Amendment {573620/1 (Senator West) 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator West) Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Floor Amendment {573620/1 (Senator West) Withdrawn 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Floor Amendment {573620/2 (Senator West) 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Substitute Floor Amendment {573620/2 (Senator West) Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Medical Cannabis – Regulation of Dispensaries, Growers, and Processors
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-1) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (129-7) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text - Chapter - Medical Cannabis – Regulation of Dispensaries, Growers, and Processors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM