Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Zucker, and Patterson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the locations of the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program to include the University of Maryland Baltimore County Training Centers that are located in the State; specifying the amounts and uses of certain grants provided under the Program; altering the date, from November 1, 2018, to on or before December 15, 2019, and each December 15 thereafter, that certain governing entities must notify the Maryland Higher Education Commission regarding the number of students enrolled in the Program for the academic year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1315
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784238/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484761/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {784238/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {484761/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1401, 11-1402, 11-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM