Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date from February 1 to December 1 each year by which the Public Service Commission is required to report to the General Assembly on the status of implementation of the renewable energy portfolio standard.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 24
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Referred Economic Matters 27
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM