Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for Proposals
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Madaleno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to issue requests for proposals for Social Impact Bonds on or before January 1, 2014; authorizing the State Board to issue additional requests for proposals as needed; establishing minimum proposal guidelines; establishing minimum project selection guidelines; authorizing the State Board to contract with specified entities; requiring the State Board to submit reports to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2015, and annually on or before September 1 thereafter; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0517
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM